House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 483 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 483 | |
House | 03/06/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 378 | |
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed |