Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1527 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/05/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    88R28076 BPG-D
 By: Bernal H.R. No. 1527


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their
 memories of devoted couple Jeff and Jackie Davis of China Spring,
 who passed away within months of each other; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Lewis and Delores Davis, Jeffery Wayne
 Davis was born on November 3, 1962; he graduated from Robinson High
 School; and
 WHEREAS, The former Jacqueline Diane Ringer was born to
 Bernard and Miriam Ringer on December 15, 1961; she graduated from
 China Spring High School; and
 WHEREAS, On April 20, 1996, Jeff and Jackie Davis were united
 in marriage; their fulfilling relationship was made even richer
 with the addition of two daughters, Meagan and Katie; and
 WHEREAS, Both husband and wife worked at his family's
 business, Krispy Chicken in Waco, for many years; later, Mr. Davis
 was employed as a salesman by Truckmotive, and Mrs. Davis was
 employed for a decade by the China Spring Independent School
 District, both on the cafeteria staff and as a classroom
 paraprofessional, and she drove Bus 58 for the district; and
 WHEREAS, Sharing many interests, Mr. and Mrs. Davis loved
 hunting, fishing, and camping, and they adored their "fur babies";
 he also enjoyed working on antique cars and watching China Spring
 football and the Baylor Bears, while she was especially keen on
 beach trips with friends and family and delighted in working with
 children; above all, they both cherished the happy times they spent
 with their daughters; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Davis passed away on November 18, 2022, at the
 age of 60; in addition to his treasured daughters, he is survived by
 his mother, Delores Davis; his siblings, Brad Davis and his wife,
 Renee, Mike Davis and his wife, Heather, and Lisa Vale and her
 husband, Michael, as well as his nephews and nieces; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Davis passed away on February 27, 2023, at the
 age of 61; she is survived by her beloved daughters; her brother,
 Ricky Ringer, and his wife, Rebecca; and many nieces, nephews,
 great-nephews, and cousins; and
 WHEREAS, United in their deep and abiding love for each other
 and for their family, Jeff and Jackie Davis lived caring and
 purposeful lives, and they will forever hold a special place in the
 hearts of those they left behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Jeffery Wayne Davis
 and Jacqueline Diane Davis and extend sincere condolences to their
 loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Jeff and
 Jackie Davis.