1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 1527 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their |
---|
6 | 6 | | memories of devoted couple Jeff and Jackie Davis of China Spring, |
---|
7 | 7 | | who passed away within months of each other; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, The son of Lewis and Delores Davis, Jeffery Wayne |
---|
9 | 9 | | Davis was born on November 3, 1962; he graduated from Robinson High |
---|
10 | 10 | | School; and |
---|
11 | 11 | | WHEREAS, The former Jacqueline Diane Ringer was born to |
---|
12 | 12 | | Bernard and Miriam Ringer on December 15, 1961; she graduated from |
---|
13 | 13 | | China Spring High School; and |
---|
14 | 14 | | WHEREAS, On April 20, 1996, Jeff and Jackie Davis were united |
---|
15 | 15 | | in marriage; their fulfilling relationship was made even richer |
---|
16 | 16 | | with the addition of two daughters, Meagan and Katie; and |
---|
17 | 17 | | WHEREAS, Both husband and wife worked at his family's |
---|
18 | 18 | | business, Krispy Chicken in Waco, for many years; later, Mr. Davis |
---|
19 | 19 | | was employed as a salesman by Truckmotive, and Mrs. Davis was |
---|
20 | 20 | | employed for a decade by the China Spring Independent School |
---|
21 | 21 | | District, both on the cafeteria staff and as a classroom |
---|
22 | 22 | | paraprofessional, and she drove Bus 58 for the district; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | WHEREAS, Sharing many interests, Mr. and Mrs. Davis loved |
---|
24 | 24 | | hunting, fishing, and camping, and they adored their "fur babies"; |
---|
25 | 25 | | he also enjoyed working on antique cars and watching China Spring |
---|
26 | 26 | | football and the Baylor Bears, while she was especially keen on |
---|
27 | 27 | | beach trips with friends and family and delighted in working with |
---|
28 | 28 | | children; above all, they both cherished the happy times they spent |
---|
29 | 29 | | with their daughters; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Davis passed away on November 18, 2022, at the |
---|
31 | 31 | | age of 60; in addition to his treasured daughters, he is survived by |
---|
32 | 32 | | his mother, Delores Davis; his siblings, Brad Davis and his wife, |
---|
33 | 33 | | Renee, Mike Davis and his wife, Heather, and Lisa Vale and her |
---|
34 | 34 | | husband, Michael, as well as his nephews and nieces; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | WHEREAS, Mrs. Davis passed away on February 27, 2023, at the |
---|
36 | 36 | | age of 61; she is survived by her beloved daughters; her brother, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Ricky Ringer, and his wife, Rebecca; and many nieces, nephews, |
---|
38 | 38 | | great-nephews, and cousins; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | WHEREAS, United in their deep and abiding love for each other |
---|
40 | 40 | | and for their family, Jeff and Jackie Davis lived caring and |
---|
41 | 41 | | purposeful lives, and they will forever hold a special place in the |
---|
42 | 42 | | hearts of those they left behind; now, therefore, be it |
---|
43 | 43 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas |
---|
44 | 44 | | Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Jeffery Wayne Davis |
---|
45 | 45 | | and Jacqueline Diane Davis and extend sincere condolences to their |
---|
46 | 46 | | loved ones; and, be it further |
---|
47 | 47 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
48 | 48 | | prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
49 | 49 | | Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Jeff and |
---|
50 | 50 | | Jackie Davis. |
---|
51 | 51 | | Bernal |
---|
52 | 52 | | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | 53 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
54 | 54 | | I certify that H.R. No. 1527 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
55 | 55 | | rising vote of the House on May 19, 2023. |
---|
56 | 56 | | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|