H.R. No. 1527 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their memories of devoted couple Jeff and Jackie Davis of China Spring, who passed away within months of each other; and WHEREAS, The son of Lewis and Delores Davis, Jeffery Wayne Davis was born on November 3, 1962; he graduated from Robinson High School; and WHEREAS, The former Jacqueline Diane Ringer was born to Bernard and Miriam Ringer on December 15, 1961; she graduated from China Spring High School; and WHEREAS, On April 20, 1996, Jeff and Jackie Davis were united in marriage; their fulfilling relationship was made even richer with the addition of two daughters, Meagan and Katie; and WHEREAS, Both husband and wife worked at his family's business, Krispy Chicken in Waco, for many years; later, Mr. Davis was employed as a salesman by Truckmotive, and Mrs. Davis was employed for a decade by the China Spring Independent School District, both on the cafeteria staff and as a classroom paraprofessional, and she drove Bus 58 for the district; and WHEREAS, Sharing many interests, Mr. and Mrs. Davis loved hunting, fishing, and camping, and they adored their "fur babies"; he also enjoyed working on antique cars and watching China Spring football and the Baylor Bears, while she was especially keen on beach trips with friends and family and delighted in working with children; above all, they both cherished the happy times they spent with their daughters; and WHEREAS, Mr. Davis passed away on November 18, 2022, at the age of 60; in addition to his treasured daughters, he is survived by his mother, Delores Davis; his siblings, Brad Davis and his wife, Renee, Mike Davis and his wife, Heather, and Lisa Vale and her husband, Michael, as well as his nephews and nieces; and WHEREAS, Mrs. Davis passed away on February 27, 2023, at the age of 61; she is survived by her beloved daughters; her brother, Ricky Ringer, and his wife, Rebecca; and many nieces, nephews, great-nephews, and cousins; and WHEREAS, United in their deep and abiding love for each other and for their family, Jeff and Jackie Davis lived caring and purposeful lives, and they will forever hold a special place in the hearts of those they left behind; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Jeffery Wayne Davis and Jacqueline Diane Davis and extend sincere condolences to their loved ones; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Jeff and Jackie Davis. Bernal ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 1527 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on May 19, 2023. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House