Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1900 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1900


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of Glenda Marie Lehnhoff of Universal
 City on April 22, 2023, at the age of 68, brought a great loss to her
 family, her friends, and the Schertz-Cibolo-Universal City
 Independent School District community; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Dorothy Roberson and Weldon Alvis
 "Butch" Roberson, the former Glenda Roberson was born in Devine on
 May 1, 1954; she grew up with four brothers, Russell, Gary, Mark,
 and Mickey, and a sister, Margaret; after graduating from Devine
 High School, she went on to complete her bachelor's degree at Texas
 A&M University; she was employed as a research lab assistant at The
 University of Texas Health Science Center; and
 WHEREAS, She married Robert Lehnhoff on February 17, 1979,
 and they were blessed with a son, Scott, and a daughter, Robin; once
 her children were in school, Mrs. Lehnhoff joined the
 Schertz-Cibolo-Universal City Independent School District as a
 computer instructional aide at Rose Garden Elementary School; she
 went on to serve as the athletic secretary, and over the course of
 two decades in that role, she and her husband, an acclaimed coach,
 worked together to mentor students and develop successful sports
 teams; the district recognized their outstanding contributions by
 naming its athletic facility the Robert & Glenda Lehnhoff Stadium;
 and
 WHEREAS, Following her retirement, Mrs. Lehnhoff embraced
 the role of full-time grandmother to Landri, Rex, Ty, Ethan, and
 Avery; she was also a very active member of Madison Hills Baptist
 Church; and
 WHEREAS, Glenda Lehnhoff touched many lives through her
 warmth and kindness, and her devotion to her family, her faith, and
 her community will remain a lasting source of inspiration to all who
 were privileged to know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Glenda Marie
 Roberson Lehnhoff and extend sincere sympathy to the members of her
 family: to her husband, Robert Lehnhoff; to her children, Scott
 Lehnhoff and his wife, Megan, and Robin Buck and her husband,
 Daniel; to her grandchildren, Landri Lehnhoff, Rex Lehnhoff, Ty
 Lehnhoff, Ethan Buck, and Avery Buck; to her siblings, Russell
 Roberson and his wife, Janet, Gary Roberson and his wife, Deb, Mark
 Roberson and his wife, Kim, Mickey Roberson and his wife, Kathy, and
 Margaret Doubrava and her husband, Robert; to her brother-in-law,
 Ernst; and to her many other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Glenda
 Marie Lehnhoff.
 Lujan
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1900 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House