Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2036 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2036


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their
 memories of Bryan Palmer, who passed away on May 9, 2023, at the age
 of 49; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Ricky Lynn and Ruth Nell Palmer, Bryan
 Palmer was born in Lamesa on February 9, 1974; he was raised in
 Sulphur Springs with his two brothers, Jason and Clint, and he
 graduated from Texas A&M University-Commerce; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Palmer enjoyed a rewarding career as an
 inventory manager for Shoot Smart; he was an avid outdoorsman and a
 life member of the National Rifle Association; and
 WHEREAS, On November 12, 2005, Mr. Palmer exchanged wedding
 vows with Ann Marie Headley, and the couple went on to share a
 rewarding marriage that spanned nearly two decades; he took great
 pride in their children, Sarah and Lauren, and their grandchild,
 Olivia; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply dedicated to his family, his faith, and his
 country, Bryan Palmer will be remembered with admiration and
 affection by all those who held him dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Bryan Palmer and
 extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Ann Marie Palmer; to his daughters, Sarah McMullen and her
 husband, Josh, and Lauren Wade; to his granddaughter, Olivia Lynn
 McMullen; to his mother, Ruth Kirkpatrick Palmer; to his brothers,
 Jason Palmer and his wife, Monique, and Clint Palmer and his wife,
 Mandy; to his nieces and nephews; and to his many other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Bryan
 Palmer.
 Raney
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2036 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House