Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2528 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2528


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life lived with joy and purpose drew to a close
 with the passing of Essie Beatrice Thomas Martin on May 7, 2023, at
 the age of 100; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Fannie and Sim Thomas, the former
 Essie Thomas was born in Jonesville, Louisiana, on June 1, 1922, and
 grew up with eight brothers and sisters; she earned a bachelor's
 degree in education from Grambling University and joined her
 siblings in Oakland, California; on April 20, 1946, she returned to
 Louisiana to marry her hometown sweetheart, Theodule "TD" Martin,
 and they were blessed with two children, Theodule "Dell" and
 Doeveal; and
 WHEREAS, The Martins lived in Archie, Louisiana, and Denver,
 Colorado, before settling in Basile, Louisiana, where Mrs. Martin
 taught sixth grade at William W. Stewart High School; the family
 relocated to California in 1969, and she became a counselor at
 Antelope Valley High School; she ultimately retired from Palmdale
 High School, and she and her husband enjoyed extensive travel and
 undertook especially memorable trips to the Caribbean, Paris, and
 Spain; active in her community, she was a co-founder of the Antelope
 Valley Juliettes and supported her former students in their
 endeavors; she was a woman of strong faith and a valued member of
 Growing Valley Church and, later, Agape Community Church; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Martin was the devoted grandmother of Jamila
 Nightingale and Angel Martin; she and her husband shared a
 fulfilling relationship until his passing, and she then resided
 with her son's family and with a granddaughter before staying in
 Garland under the care of her great-niece, Cora C. McClendon, and
 her daughter, Aisha J. McClendon; warm and caring, she kept in touch
 with family members all around the world; and
 WHEREAS, Although Essie Martin is deeply missed, she has left
 her loved ones with many cherished memories, and she will forever
 hold a special place in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Essie Beatrice Thomas
 Martin and extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to
 her son, Theodule "Dell" Martin, and his wife, Linda
 Jacobus-Martin; to her granddaughters, Jamila Nightingale and her
 husband, Cory Smith, and Angel Martin; to her five
 great-grandchildren, Donovan Smith, Kayla Smith, Shannon Smith,
 Kiah Smith, and Sanaa Smith; to her godsons, Howard Harris and Danny
 Ray Southall; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Essie
 Martin.
 Neave Criado
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2528 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 29, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House