House | 03/10/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 531 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 531 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 394 | |
House | 02/21/2023 | Filed |