Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR340 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 340


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Julius James Dubcak of Round Rock passed away on
 February 15, 2023, at the age of 83, leaving his family and friends
 to treasure their many happy memories of time spent in his company;
 and
 WHEREAS, Born on February 7, 1940, on a cotton farm in eastern
 Bell County, Julius Dubcak took great pride in being raised in a
 Czech American family; after graduating from Rogers High School in
 1958, he attended Temple Junior College and Sam Houston State
 Teachers College and earned a bachelor of business administration
 degree in 1965; he then went to work for the Texas Comptroller's
 Office in Bryan, and he continued his employment with the state
 comptroller after transferring to the Houston office; he enjoyed
 being part of Comptroller Bob Bullock's administration, and he was
 assigned to the agency's Enforcement Headquarters at the time of
 his retirement in 2000; and
 WHEREAS, After moving to Houston, Mr. Dubcak met the love of
 his life, Jeannie, whom he married on May 6, 1967; the couple shared
 a remarkable 55 years together and became the parents of a son,
 Travis; over the years, their cherished family grew to include two
 grandsons, Travis and Horacio, and a great-grandson, Nicholas;
 later in life, Mr. Dubcak and his wife traveled extensively
 throughout the U.S., Canada, and Europe, and they also enjoyed
 taking cruises; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Dubcak's love for his Czech heritage led to his
 involvement in a number of Czech American organizations; he worked
 for RVOS Insurance for 30 years, in addition to serving on the
 company's board of directors; passionate about music from an early
 age, he played the trumpet for several polka bands, most notably the
 Vrazel Polka Band, and after being an active member of Sokol in
 Houston, he served as vice president of the Sokol West in Waco; he
 was a member of the board of directors of the Western Fraternal Life
 Association from 1976 to 2007, distinguishing himself as its
 longest unopposed director; other groups that benefited greatly
 from his involvement include the Austin Czech Historical
 Association and the Travis-Williamson Counties Czech Heritage
 Society; and
 WHEREAS, Julius Dubcak enjoyed a life that was rich in
 family, friends, and accomplishments, and he will forever hold a
 special place in the hearts of those he leaves behind; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Julius James Dubcak
 and extend sincere sympathy to all those who mourn his passing; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Julius
 James Dubcak.
 Shine
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 340 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 8, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House