Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR423 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/01/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 423


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The Sons of the Republic of Texas (SRT) is hosting a
 Texas Independence Day ceremony on March 2, 2023, in celebration of
 the 187th anniversary of the birth of the Republic of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, In the midst of the Texas Revolution, 59 delegates
 signed the Texas Declaration of Independence on March 2, 1836, at
 Washington-on-the-Brazos, officially declaring Texas a free and
 independent nation and severing their political connection with the
 Mexican government; at the same time, the defenders of the Alamo
 were under siege by the Mexican Army led by General Antonio López de
 Santa Anna, and despite the many casualties at the Alamo and the
 advancing army, Texas patriots continued to fight for the next
 seven weeks, until their victory over Santa Anna at San Jacinto on
 April 21, 1836, effectively solidified the freedom of the Republic
 of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Originally established in 1893 by several sons and
 grandsons of veterans of the Texas Revolution, the SRT was
 officially incorporated as a nonprofit corporation under Texas law
 on October 20, 1934, and consists of members who are direct
 descendants of a resident of the Republic of Texas; in the decades
 since its incorporation, the organization has sought to perpetuate
 the memory and spirit of the men and women who achieved the
 independence of Texas and eventually secured its admission as a
 state of the United States of America; and
 WHEREAS, The 2023 Texas Independence Day ceremony is taking
 place at Washington-on-the-Brazos State Historic Site and will
 feature remarks by keynote speaker Dr. Bill O'Neal, a former Texas
 state historian; and
 WHEREAS, Since its inception, the Sons of the Republic of
 Texas has played a vital role in preserving and promoting the rich
 heritage of the Lone Star State, and its members may indeed take
 great pride in their contributions; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby commemorate the 2023 Texas Independence Day
 ceremony hosted by the Sons of the Republic of Texas and extend to
 all those in attendance sincere best wishes for a meaningful and
 memorable event; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the Sons of the Republic of Texas as an expression of
 high regard by the Texas House of Representatives.
 Kacal
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 423 was adopted by the House on March
 1, 2023, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House