House | 03/17/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 701 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 701 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 581 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |