Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR485 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 485


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their
 memories of Blake Rhone Subinsky of Rosharon, who passed away on
 August 31, 2021, at the age of 32; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Mark and Jackie Rhone, Blake Subinsky was
 born in Houston on January 9, 1989, and he grew up in Angleton with
 the companionship of two sisters, Erinn and Megan; he went on to
 graduate from Brazosport Christian School in 2007, and as a young
 athlete, he excelled at a variety of sports, including soccer,
 baseball, basketball, football, softball, and golf; and
 WHEREAS, After high school, Mr. Subinsky enrolled at Sam
 Houston State University, where he joined Kappa Sigma Fraternity
 and served as the fraternity's president; he earned his bachelor's
 degree from the school in 2012, and he followed in the footsteps of
 his mother and grandmother by taking a job as a regional account
 manager at HD Supply; during his free time, he actively volunteered
 with the Houston Apartment Association, and he greatly enjoyed the
 rapport he shared with his friends and colleagues in the industry;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Subinsky married the love of his life, Britney
 Subinsky, on September 19, 2020, and he was equally devoted to their
 daughter, Kailey Rae; and
 WHEREAS, Over the years, Mr. Subinsky remained a loyal fan of
 the Sam Houston Bearkats, and he also enjoyed cheering on the Dallas
 Cowboys, Houston Astros, and University of Texas Longhorns; a kind
 and gregarious young man with an infectious smile, he endeared
 himself to everyone he met, and he made every gathering all the more
 lively; and
 WHEREAS, Although his journey on this earth ended far too
 soon, Blake Subinsky touched the lives of everyone around him in
 ways beyond measure, and they will forever hold him close in their
 hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Blake Rhone
 Subinsky and extend deepest sympathy to his family and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Blake
 Subinsky.
 Vasut
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 485 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 16, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House