Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR656 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 656


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Joyce Mae Bright Swearingen of Nacogdoches on
 December 25, 2022, at the age of 98; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of George Novel and Dovie Mae Bright,
 the former Joyce Bright was born in Nacogdoches on February 4, 1924,
 and she grew up with the companionship of two brothers, N. G. and
 Charles; she attended Nacogdoches High School, and in 1943, she
 graduated from Stephen F. Austin State University, where she met
 the love of her life, James Douglas Swearingen; the couple
 exchanged wedding vows on January 10, 1946, one month after he
 returned home from World War II, and they went on to share nearly
 seven decades of marriage before his passing in 2012; and
 WHEREAS, In the late 1940s, Mrs. Swearingen embarked on a
 long and rewarding career managing Swearingen Office Equipment and
 Nacogdoches Credit Bureau alongside her husband; following the sale
 of the credit bureau in 1969, she began working at the Fredonia
 State Bank and would eventually retire as vice president, the first
 woman in the bank's history to hold the position; active in her
 professional community, she joined the East Texas Group of the
 National Association of Bank Women and was later inducted into the
 association's hall of fame for her work in finance; and
 WHEREAS, A pillar of the Nacogdoches community,
 Mrs. Swearingen gave generously of her time and talents to a number
 of clubs and civic organizations throughout her life, including
 United Way, the newcomer service club, the Fredonia Ladies and
 Gents Travel Club, the SFA Foundation, and the Nacogdoches County
 Chamber of Commerce, which she served as the first female
 president; she was also the founding chairwoman of the Nacogdoches
 Heritage Festival; a woman of faith, she was an active congregant of
 First Christian Church; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Swearingen was the devoted mother of 4
 children, Sandra Lou, James Douglas, John Novel, and Janet Kay, and
 with the passing years, she had the pleasure of seeing her family
 grow to include 9 grandchildren and 10 great-grandchildren; in her
 leisure time, she loved to cook and entertain; and
 WHEREAS, Joyce Swearingen lived a life that was rich in
 family, friends, and community service, and those who were
 privileged to share in her love and affection will forever hold her
 close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Joyce Mae Bright
 Swearingen and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn her
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Joyce
 Swearingen.
 Clardy
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 656 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 30, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House