Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR658 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/30/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:24PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:06PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:06PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:06PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:06PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:06PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:53PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:23PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:22PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:53PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 29 2023 2:31PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:54PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:10PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:10PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:11PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:31PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:31PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:31PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:32PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:32PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:32PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:32PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:10PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:10PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:10PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:11PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:52PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:12PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:22PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:22PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:22PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:22PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:34PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:51PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:34PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:34PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 29 2023 2:44PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:51PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:34PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 5:12PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 6:08PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 6:08PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Withdrawn from calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:06PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 29 2023 1:43PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:22PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:31PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:07PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 29 2023 2:37PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:34PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 29 2023 2:41PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:32PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:32PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:10PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:10PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:54PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:57PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:11PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 3:23PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:51PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:51PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:52PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 5:12PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:51PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:51PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 4:52PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 30 2023 6:08PM