Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR920 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/14/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 920


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Kimble County lost an esteemed civic leader with the
 passing of Frederica Charlotte Burt Wyatt on October 31, 2021, at
 the age of 91; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of John Matt Burt Jr. and Bessie Lee
 Allsup Burt, the former Frederica Burt was born on a ranch near
 Telegraph in Kimble County on July 2, 1930, and grew up with four
 siblings, Andrew, Fane, Britton, and Margaret; she graduated from
 the Institute of Municipal Clerks at the University of North Texas
 and became a registered professional assessor and a member of the
 Board of Tax Professional Examiners; devoted to her family, she
 shared a fulfilling marriage with her husband, Chevis R. Wyatt,
 until his passing, and she was the proud mother of a daughter,
 Charlotte; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Wyatt began her career as secretary-bookkeeper
 for the City of Junction; she was promoted to city secretary and
 went on to become the city's first female mayor; following one term,
 she returned to her job as city secretary; she further benefited her
 community in a host of other leadership roles, including president
 of the Junction Volunteer Fire Department Auxiliary, the American
 Legion Auxiliary No. 237, and the Hill Country City Secretaries
 Association; the first woman to join the Junction Rotary Club, she
 became its first female president, and she was named a Paul Harris
 Fellow; moreover, she was very involved in bicentennial and
 sesquicentennial celebrations; among other numerous accolades, she
 was named the 1967 Mrs. Citizen, the 1985 Kimble County Citizen of
 the Year, and the 1987 Texas City Secretary of the Year, and the
 city designated July 16, 1994, as "Frederica Wyatt Day"; and
 WHEREAS, When she retired after 39 years of public service,
 Mrs. Wyatt dedicated herself to researching the community's
 history and family genealogy; she was chair of the Kimble County
 Historical Commission and drafted the text for every historical
 marker in the county; in addition, she worked at the museum, oversaw
 the Junction City Cemetery, volunteered with the Cemetery Aid
 Society, and was a regent for the Daughters of the American
 Revolution; a talented writer, she completed a chronicle of local
 cemeteries and coauthored the book Coke R. Stevenson: A Texas
 Legend; she also wrote a weekly column, Meanderings, for the
 Junction Eagle and contributed to other newspapers and magazines as
 well; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply committed to her family and her community,
 Frederica Wyatt made a meaningful difference in the lives of her
 loved ones and fellow citizens alike, and her contributions will be
 remembered and admired for years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Frederica Charlotte
 Burt Wyatt and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn her
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Frederica
 Wyatt.
 Murr
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 920 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 14, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House