House | 05/24/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5171 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Record vote | RV#2037 | Journal Page: 5171 |
House | 05/24/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5171 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5171 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4997 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1299 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Filed |