Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR987 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 987


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of Saundra Gail Cullins Holland of
 Rockwall on March 17, 2023, at the age of 59, brought an
 immeasurable loss to her family and friends; and
 WHEREAS, Born to Ila and Douglas Cullins on July 1, 1963, the
 former Saundra Cullins grew up in Rockwall with the company of two
 sisters, Dana and Terri, who were her best friends; she graduated
 from Rockwall High School, and on September 4, 1982, she married her
 childhood sweetheart, Lance Aldred Holland; they became the proud
 parents of a son, Justin; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Holland worked as a legal assistant early in
 her marriage; as her husband's career in real estate advanced, she
 joined his company, Regal Realtors, and ably supported its growing
 success in the market; over the course of three decades, she served
 as a real estate assistant, licensed agent, co-owner, and
 compliance officer; she also played a kind, maternal role for many
 of the agents and won the firm's "Most Valuable Player" award
 multiple times; and
 WHEREAS, Above all, Mrs. Holland was dedicated to her family,
 which grew to include two treasured granddaughters, Wiley Beth and
 Emma Cullins Holland, who were the light of her life; she delighted
 in attending dance recitals and sports and cheer competitions, as
 well as taking beach vacations with loved ones; in addition, she
 enjoyed getaways with her friends; she shared a fulfilling marriage
 with her husband until his passing in 2011; and
 WHEREAS, Although Saundra Holland is deeply missed by those
 she left behind, they will continue to find inspiration in her
 devotion to her family and her faith, and she will forever hold a
 special place in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Saundra Gail
 Cullins Holland and extend sincere condolences to the members of
 her family: to her son, State Representative Justin Holland, and
 his wife, Neely; to her granddaughters, Wiley Beth Holland and Emma
 Cullins Holland; to her sisters, Dana Kay Macalik and her husband,
 Jeff, and Terri Raye Ferguson and her husband, James; to her
 sister-in-law, Dawn Ewing, and brother-in-law, Rodney Holland; and
 to her many other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Saundra
 Holland.
 Leach
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 987 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 20, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House