E | 05/13/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/13/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1929 | |
E | 05/02/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1491 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2788 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1455 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1443 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2374 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Record vote | RV#681 | Journal Page: 2375 |
House | 04/28/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2353 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2353 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 703 | Journal Page: 2353 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 314 | |
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |