E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5973
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5034
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1980
|
Journal Page: 5034
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5034
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5034
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1957
|
Journal Page: 4928
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4928
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Reynolds
|
Journal Page: 4928
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Bucy
|
Journal Page: 4927
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn 3-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4927
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4394
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 4394
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4393
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Postponed
|
7/28/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4374
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 4374
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1447
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5034
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 874
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 874
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 874
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 881
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 850
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 804
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 769
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 329
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 315
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|