Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor