House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4997 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2336 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3062 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 344 | |
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |