Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1088 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1088
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to eligibility to serve as a member of the board of
66 directors of the West Central Texas Municipal Water District.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Sections 3(a), (b), (c), and (d), Chapter 66,
99 Acts of the 54th Legislature, Regular Session, 1955, are amended to
1010 read as follows:
1111 (a) All powers of the District shall be exercised by a Board
1212 of Directors. Each city in the District[, each of whom] shall
1313 appoint a person to the Board of Directors, as provided by this
1414 section, [be appointed] by majority vote of the governing body of a
1515 [the] city [in which he resides].
1616 (b) The number of Directors to be appointed by [from] each
1717 city in the District shall be governed by the population of the
1818 city, according to the most recent Federal Census, as follows:
1919 (1) each [Each] city having a population of ten
2020 thousand (10,000) or less, shall appoint two (2) Directors; and
2121 (2) each [Each] city having a population of more than
2222 ten thousand (10,000), shall appoint two (2) Directors plus one (1)
2323 Director for each ten thousand (10,000) population or part thereof
2424 over ten thousand (10,000), provided however, that no city shall
2525 appoint more than one-half (1/2) of the members of the Board.
2626 (c) In [the appointment of Directors from each city which is
2727 entitled to appoint more than one (1) Director, not less than one
2828 (1) Director shall serve to and including May 31, 1956, and not less
2929 than one (1) shall serve to and including May 31, 1957, the
3030 Directors to serve for the short term and those to serve for the
3131 long term shall be specified by the governing body of the city; in
3232 May of 1956 and in] May of each year the governing body of each
3333 [such] city shall appoint the necessary Director or Directors for
3434 the two (2) year term beginning June 1st of that year. The first
3535 Director appointed by [from] any city, hereafter annexed to the
3636 District, which is entitled to only one (1) Director, may be
3737 appointed for a term ending on a May 31st not more than two (2) years
3838 from date of appointment. The subsequent Director or Directors
3939 shall be appointed as provided above.
4040 (d) Each Director shall serve for the Director's [his] term
4141 of office as herein provided, and thereafter until a [his]
4242 successor shall be appointed and qualified. No person shall be
4343 appointed a Director unless the person [he] resides in and owns
4444 taxable property in a county in which the city that [from which he
4545 is] appointed the person is located. No member of a governing body
4646 of a city, and no employee of a city shall be appointed as Director.
4747 Such Directors shall subscribe the Constitutional oath of office,
4848 and each shall give bond for the faithful performance of the
4949 Director's [his] duties in the amount of Five Thousand Dollars
5050 ($5,000), the cost of which shall be paid by the District. A
5151 majority shall constitute a quorum. If any Director no longer
5252 resides in and owns taxable property in a county in which the city
5353 that appointed the Director is located [moves from the city from
5454 which he is appointed], the governing body of such city shall
5555 appoint a Director to succeed that Director [him], for the
5656 unexpired term.
5757 SECTION 2. The West Central Texas Municipal Water District
5858 retains all rights, powers, privileges, authority, duties, and
5959 functions that it had before the effective date of this Act.
6060 SECTION 3. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
6161 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
6262 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
6363 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
6464 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
6565 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
6666 Government Code.
6767 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
6868 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
6969 Environmental Quality.
7070 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
7171 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
7272 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
7373 representatives within the required time.
7474 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
7575 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
7676 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
7777 and accomplished.
7878 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7979 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8080 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8181 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8282 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
8383 ______________________________ ______________________________
8484 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
8585 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1088 passed the Senate on
8686 April 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
8787 ______________________________
8888 Secretary of the Senate
8989 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1088 passed the House on
9090 May 9, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 8, two present
9191 not voting.
9292 ______________________________
9393 Chief Clerk of the House
9494 Approved:
9595 ______________________________
9696 Date
9797 ______________________________
9898 Governor