Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1088 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1088


 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility to serve as a member of the board of
 directors of the West Central Texas Municipal Water District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 3(a), (b), (c), and (d), Chapter 66,
 Acts of the 54th Legislature, Regular Session, 1955, are amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  All powers of the District shall be exercised by a Board
 of Directors.  Each city in the District[, each of whom] shall
 appoint a person to the Board of Directors, as provided by this
 section, [be appointed] by majority vote of the governing body of a
 [the] city [in which he resides].
 (b)  The number of Directors to be appointed by [from] each
 city in the District shall be governed by the population of the
 city, according to the most recent Federal Census, as follows:
 (1)  each [Each] city having a population of ten
 thousand (10,000) or less, shall appoint two (2) Directors; and
 (2)  each [Each] city having a population of more than
 ten thousand (10,000), shall appoint two (2) Directors plus one (1)
 Director for each ten thousand (10,000) population or part thereof
 over ten thousand (10,000), provided however, that no city shall
 appoint more than one-half (1/2) of the members of the Board.
 (c)  In [the appointment of Directors from each city which is
 entitled to appoint more than one (1) Director, not less than one
 (1) Director shall serve to and including May 31, 1956, and not less
 than one (1) shall serve to and including May 31, 1957, the
 Directors to serve for the short term and those to serve for the
 long term shall be specified by the governing body of the city; in
 May of 1956 and in] May of each year the governing body of each
 [such] city shall appoint the necessary Director or Directors for
 the two (2) year term beginning June 1st of that year.  The first
 Director appointed by [from] any city, hereafter  annexed to the
 District, which is entitled to only one (1) Director, may be
 appointed for a term ending on a May 31st not more than two (2) years
 from date of appointment.  The subsequent Director or Directors
 shall be appointed as provided above.
 (d)  Each Director shall serve for the Director's [his] term
 of office as herein provided, and thereafter until a [his]
 successor shall be appointed and qualified.  No person shall be
 appointed a Director unless the person [he] resides in and owns
 taxable property in a county in which the city that [from which he
 is] appointed the person is located.  No member of a governing body
 of a city, and no employee of a city shall be appointed as Director.
 Such Directors shall subscribe the Constitutional oath of office,
 and each shall give bond for the faithful performance of the
 Director's [his] duties in the amount of Five Thousand Dollars
 ($5,000), the cost of which shall be paid by the District.  A
 majority shall constitute a quorum.  If any Director no longer
 resides in and owns taxable property in a county in which the city
 that appointed the Director is located [moves from the city from
 which he is appointed], the governing body of such city shall
 appoint a Director to succeed that Director [him], for the
 unexpired term.
 SECTION 2.  The West Central Texas Municipal Water District
 retains all rights, powers, privileges, authority, duties, and
 functions that it had before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1088 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1088 passed the House on
 May 9, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 8, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor