E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1764
|
Journal Page: 4404
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4404
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4404
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1746
|
Journal Page: 4369
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4369
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4369
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3468
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1468
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Kolkhorst
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Blanco
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Blanco
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 946
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 945
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 881
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 704
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 685
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 507
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 348
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|