Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 14, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis May 6, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 29, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis July 19, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 19, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023