House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 999
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 999
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 999
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 998
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 998
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 998
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 998
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 348
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|