Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 28, 2023