E | 06/18/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3309 | |
E | 05/29/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3307 | |
House | 05/29/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6486 | |
Senate | 05/28/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3197 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3063 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2762 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5176 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5178 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Record vote | RV#2039 | Journal Page: 5178 |
House | 05/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 5178 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5178 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5152 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5152 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4387 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 3702 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3702 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3467 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1636 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1636 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1636 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1636 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1654 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1446 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3702 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 349 | |
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |