House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 647 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 647 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 647 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 657 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 618 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 349 | |
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |