Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1151 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 17, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 19, 2023