Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1155 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 29, 2023
Bill May 12, 2023
Bill May 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023