Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1155 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/12/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1155


 AN ACT
 relating to continuation and operations of a health care provider
 participation program by the Bexar County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 298F.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 298F.004.  EXPIRATION.  (a)  Subject to Section
 298F.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and
 operate a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2027
 [2023].
 (b)  This chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2023].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 298F, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 298F.154 to read as follows:
 Sec. 298F.154.  INTEREST AND PENALTIES.  The district may
 impose and collect interest and penalties on delinquent mandatory
 payments assessed under this chapter in any amount that does not
 exceed the maximum amount authorized for other delinquent payments
 owed to the district.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1155 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1155 passed the House on
 May 12, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 118, Nays 24, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor