E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5973
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5176
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5178
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2039
|
Journal Page: 5178
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5178
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5178
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Noble
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2576
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 353
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|