LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1195
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1195
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1195
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/03/2023
9:00 am
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
2E.20
SB1195
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 15 2023 4:58PM
HB266
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB785
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2559
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23