E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5617
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2424
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2248
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4643
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1845
|
Journal Page: 4643
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4643
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4643
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4627
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Murr
|
Journal Page: 4628
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4627
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 725
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 725
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 725
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 358
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|