House | 04/21/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 1061 |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1080 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |