Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 20, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 20, 2023