E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4833
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4333
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1724
|
Journal Page: 4333
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4333
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4332
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4256
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1693
|
Journal Page: 4255
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4255
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 4255
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 359
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|