Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 13, 2023
Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023