House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3469 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2336 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1398 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3062 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 359 | |
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |