Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 7, 2023
Analysis May 7, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023