Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 10, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023