E | 05/19/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1631 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3256 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3253 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1176 | Journal Page: 3256 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3256 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3256 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3227 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3227 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2381 | Journal Page: 3227 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 360 | |
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |