House | 05/22/2023 | Postponed | 4/21/24 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 4962 |
House | 05/22/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) | Journal Page: 4961 |
House | 05/22/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4961 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4997 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1634 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 361 | |
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |