Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 14, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023