House
|
05/22/2023
|
Postponed
|
6/1/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4952
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 4952
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4951
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4951
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Johnson
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 766
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 705
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 541
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 362
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|