Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 21, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023