E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5617
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2804
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2804
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2804
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1926
|
Journal Page: 4864
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4864
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4863
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Vet Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 364
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|