Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1308 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 17, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 22, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 19, 2023