Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1329 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/28/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R12474 MLH-D
 By: Blanco S.B. No. 1329


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing the Defense and Aerospace Manufacturing
 Task Force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 481, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 481.00661 to read as follows:
 Sec. 481.00661.  DEFENSE AND AEROSPACE MANUFACTURING TASK
 FORCE. (a)  In this section, "task force" means the Defense and
 Aerospace Manufacturing Task Force.
 (b)  The Defense and Aerospace Manufacturing Task Force is
 established within the aerospace and aviation office to study and
 make recommendations for the promotion of defense and aerospace
 manufacturing and supply chain security in this state.
 (c)  The task force is composed of nine members from the
 public and private sectors, to be appointed as follows:
 (1)  one representative from the Texas Workforce
 Commission, appointed by the governor;
 (2)  one representative from the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board, appointed by the governor;
 (3)  one representative from the Texas Economic
 Development Council, appointed by the governor;
 (4)  one representative from the Texas Military
 Preparedness Commission, appointed by the governor;
 (5)  one representative from the comptroller's office,
 appointed by the governor;
 (6)  one representative from a university receiving
 federal funds for defense and aerospace manufacturing, appointed by
 the governor; and
 (7)  three members of the defense and aerospace
 manufacturing industry, one of whom is appointed by the governor,
 one of whom is appointed by the lieutenant governor, and one of whom
 is appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2023, the governor shall
 convene the first meeting of the task force.
 (e)  The task force may obtain advice, information, and
 studies from qualified outside experts to perform its duties under
 this section.
 (f)  Task force members may not receive compensation for
 services but, subject to the availability of funding, may receive
 reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses incurred while
 performing task force business.
 (g)  The task force shall:
 (1)  identify ways to streamline coordination between
 state and local government regulation and processes;
 (2)  propose a new economic development incentive to
 attract the manufacturing and supply chain industry;
 (3)  make recommendations to improve the effectiveness
 of current economic development incentives to attract the
 manufacturing and supply chain industry;
 (4)  identify ways to bolster supply chains in this
 state; and
 (5)  make recommendations to:
 (A)  align the education-to-workforce pipeline in
 the defense and aerospace industries; and
 (B)  develop and fund apprenticeships in the
 defense and aerospace industries.
 (h)  Not later than December 1, 2024, the task force shall
 prepare and submit a written report addressing the issues under
 Subsection (g) to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the
 house of representatives, and members of the legislature.
 (i)  This section expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives shall appoint members to the Defense and
 Aerospace Manufacturing Task Force in accordance with Section
 481.00661, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.